NE LB247 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Report
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Report
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Mental Health Crisis Hotline Task Force
Title
Create the Mental Health Crisis Hotline Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Legislature - Pansing Brooks AM949 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Executive Board AM558 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Legislature - Pansing Brooks AM949 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Executive Board AM558 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Report |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 19, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM949 adopted |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Friesen AM857 withdrawn |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM740 withdrawn |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM949 filed |
2021-04-08 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2021-04-08 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM740 filed |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Friesen AM857 filed |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Executive Board AM558 adopted |
2021-03-23 | Legislature | Aguilar name added |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Executive Board AM558 filed |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM558 |
2021-02-25 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2021-02-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Arch name added |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |