NE LB242 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to assault, assault on an officer, and offenses by a confined person
Title
Change provisions relating to assault, assault on an officer, and offenses by a confined person
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2011 | |
2011-01-13 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11753 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB242.pdf |