NE LB231 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Groene MO125 pending
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to legal defense of juveniles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to legal defense of juveniles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24LegislatureGroene MO125 pending
2020-01-24LegislatureChambers MO126 withdrawn
2020-01-23LegislatureChambers MO126 pending
2020-01-23LegislatureChambers MO126 Bracket until January 24, 2020 filed
2020-01-23LegislatureGroene MO125 pending
2020-01-23LegislatureGroene MO125 pending
2020-01-23LegislatureGroene MO125 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed
2020-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2019-03-18LegislaturePlaced on General File
2019-02-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 06, 2019
2019-01-16LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2019-01-14LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback