NE LB227 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Approved by Governor on May 08, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions governing determination of a public or private nuisance under the Nebraska Right to Farm Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions governing determination of a public or private nuisance under the Nebraska Right to Farm Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-2-1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Legislature - Lathrop AM1485 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Legislature - Agriculture AM746 adopted (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Legislature - Hughes MO61 prevailed (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Legislature - Hughes AM1287 adopted (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Chambers MO58 failed (Y: 8 N: 28 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 08, 2019
2019-05-02LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 02, 2019
2019-05-02LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2019-05-02LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 46-2-1
2019-04-30LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST18
2019-04-25LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-04-25LegislatureLathrop AM1485 adopted
2019-04-25LegislatureLathrop AM1485 filed
2019-04-25LegislatureLathrop AM1332 withdrawn
2019-04-25LegislatureLathrop AM1331 withdrawn
2019-04-25LegislatureLathrop AM1330 withdrawn
2019-04-25LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER80 adopted
2019-04-15LegislatureLathrop AM1332 filed
2019-04-15LegislatureLathrop AM1331 filed
2019-04-15LegislatureLathrop AM1330 filed
2019-04-15LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER80 filed
2019-04-15LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER80
2019-04-10LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-04-10LegislatureAgriculture AM746 adopted
2019-04-10LegislatureHughes MO61 prevailed
2019-04-10LegislatureHughes MO61 Invoke cloture filed
2019-04-10LegislatureHughes AM1287 adopted
2019-04-10LegislatureHughes AM1287 pending
2019-04-10LegislatureHughes AM1287 filed
2019-04-10LegislatureChambers MO60 withdrawn
2019-04-10LegislatureChambers MO60 Recommit to the Agriculture Committee filed
2019-04-10LegislatureHughes AM1274 withdrawn
2019-04-10LegislatureHughes AM1274 filed
2019-04-10LegislatureHughes AM1201 withdrawn
2019-04-10LegislatureHughes AM1209 withdrawn
2019-04-08LegislatureChambers MO58 failed
2019-04-08LegislatureHughes AM1209 pending
2019-04-08LegislatureChambers MO58 Recommit to the Agriculture Committee filed
2019-04-08LegislatureHughes AM1209 pending
2019-04-08LegislatureAgriculture AM746 pending
2019-04-05LegislatureSlama name added
2019-04-05LegislatureHughes AM1201 filed
2019-04-05LegislatureHughes AM1209 filed
2019-03-21LegislatureAgriculture AM746 filed
2019-03-21LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM746
2019-03-19LegislatureAgriculture priority bill
2019-02-11LegislatureKolterman name added
2019-01-31LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 12, 2019
2019-01-24LegislatureBriese name added
2019-01-16LegislatureReferred to Agriculture Committee
2019-01-14LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37299
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB227.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Final/LB227.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Slip/LB227.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4379
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4421
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4420
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4422
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4423
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4575
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4640

Bill Comments

feedback