NE LB222 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to certain in lieu of tax payments made by the Game and Parks Commission
Title
Change provisions relating to certain in lieu of tax payments made by the Game and Parks Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |