NE LB22 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Approved by Governor on February 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide, change, and eliminate provisions relating to appropriations and reduce appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide, change, and eliminate provisions relating to appropriations and reduce appropriations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-13 - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-3-4 (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15LegislatureApproved by Governor on February 15, 2017
2017-02-15LegislatureRiepe explanation of vote
2017-02-13LegislaturePresented to Governor on February 13, 2017
2017-02-13LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-02-13LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-3-4
2017-02-13LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-02-13LegislatureStinner MO35 prevailed
2017-02-13LegislatureStinner MO35 Invoke cloture filed
2017-02-13LegislatureChambers MO34 failed
2017-02-13LegislatureChambers MO34 Bracket until February 27, 2017 filed
2017-02-13LegislatureChambers MO33 failed
2017-02-13LegislatureChambers MO33 Reconsider the vote to return to Select File filed
2017-02-13LegislatureKrist AM235 withdrawn
2017-02-13LegislatureKrist motion to return to Select File failed
2017-02-13LegislatureKrist AM151 withdrawn
2017-02-13LegislatureKrist AM104 withdrawn
2017-02-09LegislatureKrist AM235 filed
2017-02-09LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-02-08LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-02-08LegislatureChambers MO32 failed
2017-02-08LegislatureChambers MO32 Indefinitely postpone filed
2017-02-08LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER4 adopted
2017-02-06LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER4 filed
2017-02-06LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER4
2017-02-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-02-03LegislatureAppropriations AM13 adopted
2017-02-03LegislatureKrist AM135 withdrawn
2017-02-03LegislatureKrist MO27 withdrawn
2017-02-02LegislatureChambers MO30 failed
2017-02-02LegislatureChambers MO30 Bracket until April 1, 2017 filed
2017-02-02LegislatureKrist AM151 filed
2017-02-02LegislatureKrist MO27 pending
2017-02-02LegislatureChambers MO29 withdrawn
2017-02-01LegislatureChambers MO29 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed
2017-02-01LegislatureKrist AM135 filed
2017-02-01LegislatureChambers MO28 failed
2017-02-01LegislatureChambers MO28 Bracket until April 01, 2017 filed
2017-02-01LegislatureKrist MO27 pending
2017-02-01LegislatureKrist MO27 Recommit to Appropriations Committee filed
2017-01-31LegislatureKrist AM104 refiled
2017-01-31LegislatureKrist AM104 withdrawn
2017-01-31LegislatureKrist AM104 filed
2017-01-31LegislatureAppropriations AM13 pending
2017-01-27LegislatureAppropriations AM13 filed
2017-01-27LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM13
2017-01-10LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 17, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Appropriations Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback