NE LB211 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change the minimum wage for persons compensated by way of gratuities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change the minimum wage for persons compensated by way of gratuities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-02-02LegislatureHansen AM1604 pending
2018-02-01LegislatureBolz name added
2018-01-26LegislaturePansing Brooks name added
2018-01-23LegislatureHansen AM1604 filed
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-03-15LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-02-02LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 27, 2017
2017-01-12LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2017-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback