NE LB210 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to performance audit standards and the distribution of reports under the Legislative Performance Audit Act
Title
Change provisions relating to performance audit standards and the distribution of reports under the Legislative Performance Audit Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Executive Board AM113 adopted |
2017-03-02 | Legislature | Legislative Performance Audit priority bill |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Executive Board AM113 filed |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM113 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2017 |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |