NE LB209 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to treatment of deferred compensation by certain political subdivisions, state agencies, and the Public Employees Retirement Board
Title
Change provisions relating to treatment of deferred compensation by certain political subdivisions, state agencies, and the Public Employees Retirement Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Legislature - Nebraska Retirement Systems AM880 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Legislature - Nebraska Retirement Systems AM880 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 19, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-05-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER71 adopted |
2021-04-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER71 filed |
2021-04-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER71 |
2021-04-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-04-26 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM880 adopted |
2021-04-08 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM880 filed |
2021-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM880 |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |