NE LB205 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designate funds appropriated to the Department of Health and Human Services for state aid
Title
Designate funds appropriated to the Department of Health and Human Services for state aid
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 14, 2017 |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31430 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB205.pdf |