NE LB20 | 2024 | 108th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-07-29 - Notice of hearing for July 30, 2024
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-07-29 - Notice of hearing for July 30, 2024
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide an income tax credit for renters and change provisions relating to a property tax credit
Title
Provide an income tax credit for renters and change provisions relating to a property tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for July 30, 2024 |
2024-07-26 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2024-07-26 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-07-25 | Legislature | Date of introduction |