NE LB20 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Provisions/portions of LB668 amended into LB20 by AM657
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Provisions/portions of LB668 amended into LB20 by AM657
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regulate the sale of methamphetamine precursors
Title
Regulate the sale of methamphetamine precursors
Sponsors
Sen. Beau McCoy [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Provisions/portions of LB668 amended into LB20 by AM657 | |
2011-04-14 | Approved by Governor on April 14, 2011 | |
2011-04-13 | McGill explanation of vote | |
2011-04-11 | Presented to Governor on April 08, 2011 | |
2011-04-08 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-04-08 | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on Final Reading with ST12 | |
2011-03-29 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-03-29 | Lautenbaugh AM1027 adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Lautenbaugh AM1027 filed | |
2011-03-29 | Flood AM657 adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Enrollment and Review ER11 adopted | |
2011-03-08 | Flood AM657 filed | |
2011-02-04 | Enrollment and Review ER11 filed | |
2011-02-04 | Placed on Select File with ER11 | |
2011-02-03 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-02-03 | Judiciary AM64 adopted | |
2011-02-03 | Lathrop FA4 withdrawn | |
2011-02-03 | Lathrop FA4 pending | |
2011-02-03 | Ashford MO8 failed | |
2011-02-03 | Ashford MO8 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed | |
2011-02-03 | Ashford MO6 withdrawn | |
2011-02-02 | Ashford MO6 pending | |
2011-02-02 | Ashford MO6 Bracket until June 1, 2011 filed | |
2011-02-02 | Lathrop FA4 pending | |
2011-02-02 | Lathrop FA4 filed | |
2011-02-02 | Lautenbaugh FA3 adopted | |
2011-02-02 | Lautenbaugh FA3 filed | |
2011-02-02 | Judiciary AM64 pending | |
2011-01-25 | Judiciary AM64 filed | |
2011-01-25 | Placed on General File with AM64 | |
2011-01-11 | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2011 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |