NE LB2 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Vargas name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Vargas name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Commission on Asian American Affairs
Title
Create the Commission on Asian American Affairs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2024-02-29 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2023 |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |