NE LB2 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-10 - Approved by Governor on February 10, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-10 - Approved by Governor on February 10, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revisor bill to repeal obsolete statutes relating to the Water Policy Task Force, ground water conservation districts, and certain provisional permits
Title
Revisor bill to repeal obsolete statutes relating to the Water Policy Task Force, ground water conservation districts, and certain provisional permits
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | Approved by Governor on February 10, 2011 | |
2011-02-04 | Presented to Governor on February 04, 2011 | |
2011-02-04 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-02-04 | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 | |
2011-01-25 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-01-24 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-01-21 | Placed on Select File | |
2011-01-20 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-01-10 | Placed on General File | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |