NE LB199 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Hunt name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Hunt name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a driving privilege card for federally authorized aliens
Title
Provide for a driving privilege card for federally authorized aliens
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB199 amended into LB138 by AM837 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-05-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-05-02 | Legislature | Fredrickson name added |
2023-02-15 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. name added |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2023 |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |