NE LB196 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Rural Health Systems and Professional Incentive Act
Title
Change provisions of the Rural Health Systems and Professional Incentive Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER131 adopted |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER131 filed |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER131 |
2015-05-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-05-13 | Legislature | Campbell AM696 adopted |
2015-03-16 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2015-03-09 | Legislature | Campbell AM696 filed |
2015-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 20, 2015 |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |