NE LB196 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Approved by Governor on May 25, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Approved by Governor on May 25, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds for salaries of members of the Legislature
Title
Appropriate funds for salaries of members of the Legislature
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Adams [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 25, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2013-05-20 | Legislature | Chambers FA82 withdrawn |
2013-05-20 | Legislature | Chambers FA82 filed |
2013-05-20 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File failed |
2013-05-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-05-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Chambers FA75 withdrawn |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Chambers FA75 filed |
2013-05-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-02-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2013 |
2013-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2013-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |