NE LB195 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Halloran priority bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Faithful Delegate to Federal Article V Convention Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Faithful Delegate to Federal Article V Convention Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-22LegislatureHalloran priority bill
2023-02-16LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM92 filed
2023-02-16LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM92
2023-01-24LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 02, 2023
2023-01-11LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2023-01-09LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback