NE LB194 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Provisions/portions of LB582 amended into LB194 by AM655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Provisions/portions of LB582 amended into LB194 by AM655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for deficit appropriations
Title
Provide for deficit appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Adams [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB582 amended into LB194 by AM655 |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Communication |
2013-05-28 | Legislature | Carlson MO98 withdrawn |
2013-05-28 | Legislature | Carlson MO98 Becomes law notwithstanding the line-item objections of the Governor filed |
2013-05-28 | Legislature | Appropriations Committee Report |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor with line-item veto on May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2013-05-20 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2013-05-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Dubas AM1395 adopted |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Dubas AM1395 filed |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER97 adopted |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER97 filed |
2013-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER97 |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Appropriations AM655 adopted |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Wallman AM1345 withdrawn |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Krist AM1342 withdrawn |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Dubas AM1324 adopted |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Chambers MO65 prevailed |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Chambers MO65 Reconsider the vote taken on AM1324 filed |
2013-05-09 | Legislature | Wallman AM1345 filed |
2013-05-09 | Legislature | Krist AM1342 filed |
2013-05-09 | Legislature | Dubas AM1324 lost |
2013-05-09 | Legislature | Appropriations AM655 pending |
2013-05-08 | Legislature | Dubas AM1324 filed |
2013-05-01 | Legislature | Appropriations AM655 filed |
2013-05-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM655 |
2013-02-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2013 |
2013-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2013-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |