NE LB187 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require appointment of counsel for tenants in eviction proceedings in counties containing a city of the metropolitan class or primary class
Title
Require appointment of counsel for tenants in eviction proceedings in counties containing a city of the metropolitan class or primary class
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 08, 2023 |
2023-01-31 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |