NE LB187 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB187 amended into LB148 by AM192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB187 amended into LB148 by AM192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase a dollar threshold for transactions exempt from registration under the Securities Act of Nebraska, provide for an annual adjustment to such amount, and provide for the effect of exempt sales on malpractice premiums
Title
Increase a dollar threshold for transactions exempt from registration under the Securities Act of Nebraska, provide for an annual adjustment to such amount, and provide for the effect of exempt sales on malpractice premiums
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB187 amended into LB148 by AM192 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2017 |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31279 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB187.pdf |