NE LB182 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change paternity provisions for a child conceived as a result of sexual assault
Title
Change paternity provisions for a child conceived as a result of sexual assault
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Avery [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2013-03-18 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2013-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2013 |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18297 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB182.pdf |