NE LB180 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for bridge orders transferring juvenile court jurisdiction of a juvenile to a district court
Title
Provide for bridge orders transferring juvenile court jurisdiction of a juvenile to a district court
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2017-04-11 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Bolz AM866 adopted |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Bolz AM866 filed |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER43 adopted |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER43 filed |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER43 |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Bolz AM43 adopted |
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Bolz AM43 filed |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2017-02-06 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2017-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2017 |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |