NE LB18 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Presented to Governor on March 23, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Change licensure and scope of practice for dental assistants and dental hygienists

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change licensure and scope of practice for dental assistants and dental hygienists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 23, 2017
2017-03-23LegislatureWayne explanation of vote
2017-03-23LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-03-23LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 46-0-3
2017-03-23LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-03-14LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-03-13LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-03-13LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER6 adopted
2017-02-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER6 filed
2017-02-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER6
2017-02-21LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-02-21LegislatureKolterman AM24 adopted
2017-02-16LegislatureKolterman AM24 pending
2017-02-16LegislatureKolterman AM24 filed
2017-02-06LegislatureHilkemann name added
2017-01-20LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-09LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 18, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback