NE LB176 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB176 amended into LB814 by AM1581
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB176 amended into LB814 by AM1581
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent regarding appropriations to the Supreme Court for interpreter services
Title
State intent regarding appropriations to the Supreme Court for interpreter services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB176 amended into LB814 by AM1581 |
2023-03-13 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2023-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2023 |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |