NE LB176 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate obsolete provisions related to milldams
Title
Eliminate obsolete provisions related to milldams
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 04, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-01-31 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2017 |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |