NE LB176 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-11 - Approved by Governor on February 11, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-11 - Approved by Governor on February 11, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Competitive Livestock Markets Act and provisions relating to contract swine operations
Title
Change the Competitive Livestock Markets Act and provisions relating to contract swine operations
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Schilz [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-05 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 34-14-1 (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 11, 2016 |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 05, 2016 |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 34-14-1 |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Schilz MO175 prevailed |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Schilz MO175 Invoke cloture filed |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Davis AM1886 withdrawn |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File failed |
2016-01-25 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST55 |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Bloomfield AM1887 filed |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Schilz MO164 prevailed |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Schilz MO164 Invoke cloture filed |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Schilz AM1855 adopted |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Schilz AM1755 adopted |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Davis AM1848 withdrawn |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Davis AM1886 filed |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Schilz AM1855 filed |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Davis AM1848 pending |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Davis AM1848 pending |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Davis AM1608 withdrawn |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Davis AM1848 filed |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Schilz priority bill |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Attorney General Opinion 15-013 to Schilz |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Schilz AM1755 filed |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Davis AM1608 filed |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Schilz MO140 failed |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Schilz MO140 Invoke cloture filed |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | McCoy FA79 withdrawn |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | McCoy FA79 filed |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Groene AM1634 adopted |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Groene AM1634 pending |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Bloomfield AM1636 lost |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER143 adopted |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER143 filed |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER143 |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Schilz MO138 prevailed |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Schilz MO138 Invoke cloture filed |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Davis AM1635 adopted |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Agriculture AM495 adopted |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | McCoy AM1685 lost |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Schnoor AM1672 lost |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Sullivan MO137 failed |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Sullivan MO137 Recommit to Agriculture Committee filed |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Schnoor AM1672 pending |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO136 failed |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO136 Reconsider the vote taken on AM1633 filed |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Schnoor AM1633 lost |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Schilz AM1263 withdrawn |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Agriculture AM495 pending |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO134 failed |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO134 pending |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO134 Bracket until April 15, 2016 filed |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Agriculture AM495 pending |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | McCoy MO120 withdrawn |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | Groene AM1634 filed |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Bloomfield AM1636 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | McCoy AM1685 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Davis AM1635 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Schnoor AM1672 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Schnoor AM1633 filed |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | McCoy MO120 Bracket until June 5, 2015 filed |
2015-04-15 | Legislature | Schilz AM1263 filed |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Schilz priority bill |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Agriculture AM495 filed |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM495 |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2015 |
2015-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |