NE LB174 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Enrollment and Review ER10 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to highways and highway funding, road classifications, licensure of local highway and street superintendents, motor vehicle safety responsibility, accident reports, and the Nebraska Rules of the Road

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to highways and highway funding, road classifications, licensure of local highway and street superintendents, motor vehicle safety responsibility, accident reports, and the Nebraska Rules of the Road

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER10 filed
2021-02-24LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER10
2021-02-16LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2021-02-02LegislaturePlaced on General File
2021-01-15LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 25, 2021
2021-01-12LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2021-01-08LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback