NE LB172 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Notice of hearing for March 01, 2021
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Hearing: Mar 1 @ 9:30 am in Room 1524
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to benefit payments under the Employment Security Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to benefit payments under the Employment Security Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 01, 2021
2021-01-15LegislatureHunt name added
2021-01-12LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-08LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback