NE LB17 | 2024 | 108th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-07-29 - Notice of hearing for July 30, 2024
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-07-29 - Notice of hearing for July 30, 2024
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the Perkins County Canal Project Act and provide for the termination of the Perkins County Canal Project Fund
Title
Repeal the Perkins County Canal Project Act and provide for the termination of the Perkins County Canal Project Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for July 30, 2024 |
2024-07-26 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2024-07-25 | Legislature | Date of introduction |