NE LB167 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Notice of hearing for February 07, 2019
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit conversion therapy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit conversion therapy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 07, 2019
2019-01-15LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2019-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback