NE LB166 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change filing and enforcement provisions of the Nebraska Political Accountability and Disclosure Act
Title
Change filing and enforcement provisions of the Nebraska Political Accountability and Disclosure Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Seiler name added |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Schnoor name added |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Harr name added |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Friesen name added |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Cook name added |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Williams name added |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Watermeier name added |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Hilkemann name added |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Ebke name added |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Sullivan name added |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Kuehn name added |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Krist name added |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Davis name added |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Bolz name added |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Baker name added |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Haar name added |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Schumacher name added |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Howard name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Morfeld name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Scheer name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Garrett name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Kolowski name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Stinner name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Campbell name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2015 |
2015-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |