NE LB158 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Hughes MO87 pending
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to appointment of counsel for juveniles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to appointment of counsel for juveniles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12LegislatureHughes MO87 pending
2017-04-12LegislatureHughes MO87 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed
2017-04-12LegislaturePansing Brooks AM996 pending
2017-04-12LegislatureKrist MO79 prevailed
2017-04-12LegislatureKrist MO79 pending
2017-04-12LegislatureKrist MO79 Reconsider the vote on AM996 filed
2017-04-12LegislaturePansing Brooks AM996 lost
2017-04-12LegislaturePansing Brooks AM996 filed
2017-04-12LegislatureJudiciary AM145 pending
2017-03-23LegislatureHansen name added
2017-03-06LegislaturePansing Brooks priority bill
2017-02-06LegislatureJudiciary AM145 filed
2017-02-06LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM145
2017-01-17LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 26, 2017
2017-01-10LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-09LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback