NE LB151 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB90 amended into LB151 by AM334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change and provide for duties of the Auditor of Public Accounts and certain audited entities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change and provide for duties of the Auditor of Public Accounts and certain audited entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB90 amended into LB151 by AM334
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB89 amended into LB151 by AM334
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB27 amended into LB151 by AM334
2017-05-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 27, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0
2017-04-24LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST11
2017-04-04LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-04LegislatureStinner AM813 adopted
2017-04-04LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER31 adopted
2017-03-31LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER31 filed
2017-03-31LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER31
2017-03-29LegislatureStinner AM813 filed
2017-03-28LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-28LegislatureStinner AM428 adopted
2017-03-28LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM334 adopted
2017-03-23LegislatureStinner AM428 filed
2017-03-13LegislatureSpeaker priority bill
2017-02-27LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM334 filed
2017-02-27LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM334
2017-01-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 19, 2017
2017-01-10LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-01-09LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback