NE LB148 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB187 amended into LB148 by AM192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions of the Securities Act of Nebraska

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions of the Securities Act of Nebraska

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB187 amended into LB148 by AM192
2017-05-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 27, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 49-0-0
2017-04-24LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-04-05LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-03LegislatureSchumacher AM835 adopted
2017-04-03LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER21 adopted
2017-03-31LegislatureSchumacher AM835 filed
2017-03-22LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER21 filed
2017-03-22LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER21
2017-03-21LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-21LegislatureSchumacher AM192 adopted
2017-03-03LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance priority bill
2017-02-24LegislatureSchumacher AM192 filed
2017-02-02LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 31, 2017
2017-01-10LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2017-01-09LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback