NE LB147 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change workers' compensation provisions relating to waiting time, termination of compensation, and attorney's fees
Title
Change workers' compensation provisions relating to waiting time, termination of compensation, and attorney's fees
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2017 |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31075 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB147.pdf |