NE LB142 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine effective financing statement and change provisions relating to the master lien list with respect to farm product security interests
Title
Redefine effective financing statement and change provisions relating to the master lien list with respect to farm product security interests
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 04, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER70 adopted |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER70 filed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER70 |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Williams AM179 adopted |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Williams AM179 filed |
2017-01-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2017 |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |