NE LB14 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for truth in advertising and labeling in the sale of meat and provide a penalty

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for truth in advertising and labeling in the sale of meat and provide a penalty

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24LegislatureBill withdrawn
2019-01-24LegislatureBlood MO3 prevailed
2019-01-22LegislatureBlood MO3 Withdraw bill filed
2019-01-17LegislatureDorn name added
2019-01-15LegislatureBrandt name added
2019-01-15LegislatureWilliams name added
2019-01-14LegislatureBriese name added
2019-01-14LegislatureWalz name added
2019-01-14LegislatureLinehan name added
2019-01-14LegislatureReferred to Agriculture Committee
2019-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback