NE LB138 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB796 amended into LB138 by AM1218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB796 amended into LB138 by AM1218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt updates to federal law relating to motor vehicles and motor carriers and change provisions relating to transportation
Title
Adopt updates to federal law relating to motor vehicles and motor carriers and change provisions relating to transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-0-8 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM1975 adopted (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Legislature - DeBoer AM1218 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Legislature - Raybould AM1207 adopted (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Legislature - Moser AM1138 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Legislature - Brewer AM837 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM1975 adopted (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Legislature - DeBoer AM1218 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Legislature - Raybould AM1207 adopted (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Legislature - Moser AM1138 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Legislature - Brewer AM837 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB796 amended into LB138 by AM1218 |
2023-06-21 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB738 amended into LB138 by AM1207 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB465 amended into LB138 by AM1138 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB453 amended into LB138 by AM1218 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB199 amended into LB138 by AM837 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB91 amended into LB138 by AM1975 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on June 1, 2023 |
2023-05-31 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 31, 2023 |
2023-05-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2023-05-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-0-8 |
2023-05-31 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2023-05-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST25 recorded |
2023-05-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST25 filed |
2023-05-25 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second with ST25 |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Hansen, B. AM1975 adopted |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Hansen, B. AM1975 filed |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Slama MO1102 withdrawn |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Slama MO1101 withdrawn |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Slama MO1100 withdrawn |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Slama MO1099 withdrawn |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Slama MO1098 withdrawn |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Slama MO1097 withdrawn |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Slama MO1096 withdrawn |
2023-05-24 | Legislature | Hunt MO320 withdrawn |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama MO1102 Bracket until June 10, 2023 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama MO1101 Bracket until June 10, 2023 filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama MO1100 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama MO1099 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama MO1098 Recommit to the Government, Military, and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama MO1097 Recommit to the Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Slama MO1096 Recommit to the Government, Military, and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2023-04-13 | Legislature | DeKay name added |
2023-04-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST4 recorded |
2023-04-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST4 filed |
2023-04-13 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST4 |
2023-04-12 | Legislature | Bosn name added |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM1001 withdrawn |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM1000 withdrawn |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM999 withdrawn |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM1003 withdrawn |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | DeBoer AM1218 adopted |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | DeBoer AM1218 filed |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Raybould AM1207 adopted |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Raybould AM1207 filed |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Moser AM1138 adopted |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Moser AM1138 filed |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Brewer AM837 adopted |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Brewer AM585 withdrawn |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Hunt MO319 withdrawn |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Hunt MO318 withdrawn |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Hunt MO317 withdrawn |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Hunt MO316 withdrawn |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Hunt MO315 withdrawn |
2023-04-05 | Legislature | Hunt MO314 withdrawn |
2023-04-03 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2023-04-03 | Legislature | Raybould name added |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO319 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO316 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO320 Recommit to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO318 Recommit to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO315 Recommit to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO317 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO314 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-28 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM1001 filed |
2023-03-28 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM1000 filed |
2023-03-28 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM999 filed |
2023-03-28 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM1003 filed |
2023-03-15 | Legislature | Brewer AM837 filed |
2023-03-15 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2023-02-28 | Legislature | Brewer AM585 filed |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2023-02-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2023-02-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2023 |
2023-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2023-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |