NE LB138 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Group Health Trust Fund and provide for investment and provide duties for the State Treasurer
Title
Create the Group Health Trust Fund and provide for investment and provide duties for the State Treasurer
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2013 |
2013-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2013-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=17947 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB138.pdf |