NE LB137 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Hunt AM3088 to AM2828 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for a penalty enhancement for a controlled substances violation resulting in serious bodily injury or death

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for a penalty enhancement for a controlled substances violation resulting in serious bodily injury or death

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-18 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO1230 failed (Y: 3 N: 23 NV: 14 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Legislature - Judiciary AM2154 adopted (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Legislature - Wayne FA229 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-18LegislatureHunt AM3088 to AM2828 filed
2024-03-18LegislatureHunt AM3039 to ER72 filed
2024-03-18LegislatureHunt AM3089 to FA231 filed
2024-03-18LegislatureHunt AM3084 to ER72 filed
2024-03-18LegislatureWayne AM3076 to ER72 filed
2024-03-18LegislatureWayne AM2790 to ER72 filed
2024-03-18LegislaturePassed over
2024-03-18LegislatureBosn MO1269 pending
2024-03-18LegislatureBosn MO1269 Withdraw FA231 and substitute AM2828 filed
2024-03-18LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1230 failed
2024-03-18LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER72 adopted
2024-03-15LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1263 Indefinitely postpone filed
2024-03-15LegislatureWayne AM2970 to ER72 filed
2024-03-06LegislatureBosn AM2828 filed
2024-03-04LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1230 Bracket until April 11, 2024 filed
2024-03-04LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1229 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed
2024-03-04LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1228 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed
2024-03-04LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER72 filed
2024-03-04LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER72
2024-02-29LegislatureBosn FA231 filed
2024-02-22LegislatureWayne AM2675 to AM2154 filed
2024-02-22LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2024-02-22LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1194 withdrawn
2024-02-22LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1193 withdrawn
2024-02-22LegislatureBosn FA219 withdrawn
2024-02-22LegislatureJudiciary AM2154 adopted
2024-02-22LegislatureWayne FA229 adopted
2024-02-22LegislatureWayne FA229 filed
2024-02-22LegislatureWayne AM2643 withdrawn
2024-02-22LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1192 failed
2024-02-22LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1192 pending
2024-02-21LegislatureAlbrecht name added
2024-02-21LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1194 Bracket until February 23, 2024 filed
2024-02-21LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1193 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed
2024-02-21LegislatureWayne AM2643 to AM2154 filed
2024-02-21LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1192 pending
2024-02-21LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO1192 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed
2024-02-20LegislatureBosn FA219 filed
2024-02-20LegislatureJudiciary AM2154 filed
2024-02-20LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2154
2024-01-05LegislatureBrewer name added
2024-01-04LegislatureBallard name added
2024-01-04LegislatureBostar name added
2024-01-03LegislatureJacobson name added
2024-01-03LegislatureDeKay name added
2024-01-03LegislatureLowe name added
2024-01-03LegislatureBrandt name added
2024-01-03LegislatureHoldcroft name added
2024-01-03LegislatureHoldcroft priority bill
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-04-12LegislatureBosn name added
2023-03-16LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 23, 2023
2023-01-10LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2023-01-06LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=50359
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LB137.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO1269.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/FA231.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO1228.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO1229.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2828.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO1263.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM3039.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2970.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2790.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2675.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM3076.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM3084.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM3089.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM3088.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO1230.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/ER72.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO1194.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO1193.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/FA219.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2154.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/FA229.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2643.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO1192.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/SI/LB137.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB137_20230322-132500.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/CS/LB137.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10112
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10113
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10114
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10377

Bill Comments

feedback