NE LB137 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Wayne name added
Pending: Legislature General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Fantasy Contests Act and provide a gambling exception

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Fantasy Contests Act and provide a gambling exception

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21LegislatureWayne name added
2019-02-21LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 04, 2019
2019-01-15LegislatureReferred to General Affairs Committee
2019-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback