NE LB13 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB13 amended into LB265 by AM878
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB13 amended into LB265 by AM878
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change Community-based Juvenile Services Aid Program provisions
Title
Change Community-based Juvenile Services Aid Program provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB13 amended into LB265 by AM878 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2015-03-03 | Legislature | Judiciary AM466 filed |
2015-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM466 |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |