NE LB13 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require radon resistant construction for residential construction and create a building codes task force
Title
Require radon resistant construction for residential construction and create a building codes task force
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | Krist MO131 approved |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | Krist MO131 Unanimous consent to bracket until April 10, 2014 filed |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER121 adopted |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Krist MO128 Bracket until April 10, 2014 filed |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER121 filed |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER121 |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Krist AM1604 withdrawn |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Krist AM920 withdrawn |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM260 adopted |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Krist AM1604 filed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-04-04 | Legislature | Krist AM920 filed |
2013-02-22 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM260 filed |
2013-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM260 |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2013 |
2013-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=17921 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB13.pdf |