NE LB1284 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1254 amended into LB1284 by AM3061
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1254 amended into LB1284 by AM3061
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for and change teacher incentive programs, provide for a pilot program to distribute menstrual products in schools, a Dyslexia Research Grant Program, a professional learning system relating to instruction in reading, and a statewide computer science education expansion program, create and change authorized use of certain funds, and change provisions relating to school psychologists and certain scholarship programs
Title
Provide for and change teacher incentive programs, provide for a pilot program to distribute menstrual products in schools, a Dyslexia Research Grant Program, a professional learning system relating to instruction in reading, and a statewide computer science education expansion program, create and change authorized use of certain funds, and change provisions relating to school psychologists and certain scholarship programs
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-0-7 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Linehan FA415 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Walz AM3414 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Legislature - Education AM3061 adopted (Y: 25 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Linehan FA415 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Legislature - Walz AM3414 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Legislature - Education AM3061 adopted (Y: 25 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1254 amended into LB1284 by AM3061 |
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1253 amended into LB1284 by AM3061 |
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1252 amended into LB1284 by AM3061 |
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1050 amended into LB1284 by AM3061 |
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1014 amended into LB1284 by AM3061 |
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1005 amended into LB1284 by AM3061 |
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB986 amended into LB1284 by AM3061 |
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB985 amended into LB1284 by AM3061 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 16, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-0-7 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST71 recorded |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ST71 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST71 |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Linehan FA415 adopted |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Linehan FA415 to AM3414 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Walz AM3414 adopted |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Walz AM3414 to AM3061 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER119 adopted |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER119 filed |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER119 |
2024-03-27 | Legislature | Dungan name added |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-03-21 | Legislature | Education AM3061 adopted |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2024-03-19 | Legislature | Education AM3061 filed |
2024-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM3061 |
2024-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2024 |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Walz priority bill |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |