NE LB127 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine immediate family for purposes of limited permits for hunting
Title
Redefine immediate family for purposes of limited permits for hunting
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hughes [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Natural Resources AM184 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Natural Resources AM184 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM184 adopted |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM184 filed |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM184 |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |