NE LB1223 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1223 amended into LB921 by AM2503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1223 amended into LB921 by AM2503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require reimbursement for lodging certain defendants in county jails and require state hospitals to maintain beds for certain patients
Title
Require reimbursement for lodging certain defendants in county jails and require state hospitals to maintain beds for certain patients
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1223 amended into LB921 by AM2503 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |