NE LB1213 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide requirements regarding access to digital and online resources provided by school districts, schools, and the Nebraska Library Commission for students
Title
Provide requirements regarding access to digital and online resources provided by school districts, schools, and the Nebraska Library Commission for students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-03-16 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2336 filed |
2022-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2336 |
2022-02-01 | Legislature | Clements name added |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Gragert name added |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Bostelman name added |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Albrecht priority bill |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |