NE LB1211 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change requirements for the preparation of proposed budget statements under the Nebraska Budget Act
Title
Change requirements for the preparation of proposed budget statements under the Nebraska Budget Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41182 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1211.pdf |