NE LB120 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Notice of hearing for March 04, 2019
Pending: Legislature Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require teacher and school staff to receive training on behavioral and mental health

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require teacher and school staff to receive training on behavioral and mental health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 04, 2019
2019-01-14LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2019-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback